THE SNELL CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives bursaries to children and young adults in full time education and occasional grants to schools to assist their pupils who would not otherwise be able to attend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 July 1975: Standard registration
- MOWDEN SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY FOOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
C E M SNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.37k | £5.78k | £6.42k | £8.11k | £8.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £2.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED PPR 9TH SEPTEMBER 1937 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO LIVE IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE EAST SUSSEX OR WEST SUSSEX IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THING FIT INCLUDING BY AWARDING SUCH PERSONS BURSARIES SCHOLARSHIPS MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FOR THEIR EDUCATION ( INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS) ENABLING THEM TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 MARLBOROUGH PLACE
BRIGHTON
BN1 1UB
- Phone:
- 01273608003
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window