Trustees WEYMOUTH WEST SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 269375
Up to date (103 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Naylor | Chair | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Miriam Isbell | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqui Clark | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Richards | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Isbell | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Bryony Bishton | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Serena Warren | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lorraine Ovenden | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Desmond Lochrie | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
Charlotte Cartwright | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Camp | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
GARY CLOTHIER | Trustee | 05 February 2012 |
|
|||||||
PAUL KINGMAN | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET Parrin | Trustee | 18 May 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.