THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST FUND ALSO KNOWN AS THE ROMANIAN PATRIARCHAL ORTHODOX CHURCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST FUND

Charity number: 269405
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious, social and charitable activities relating to the Romanian community in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £57,896
Total expenditure: £58,879

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1975: Standard registration
  • 19 February 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 19 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1191639 THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £119.49k £124.32k £110.38k £95.04k £57.90k
Total expenditure £58.34k £88.71k £71.00k £58.30k £58.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On Time