Trustees CHILCOMPTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 269417

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER TATAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Wilmot Stanford | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hayne | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jill Newman | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNN WULCKO | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JOAN MCQUITTY | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARLENE PICKFORD | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROS BIDMEAD | Trustee | 01 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE OGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VYVYAN PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIDGET BROOKBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.