Financial history HOSPITAL RADIO BEDFORD

Charity number: 269428
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.02k £2.82k £1.41k £1.41k £4.60k
Total expenditure £1.99k £3.05k £1.97k £1.97k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A