WATFORD APOSTOLIC PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IMCGB is a regulator for pentecostal and independent churches and their ministers to ensure the highest standards of ministerial practice in order to protect members of the public who need the services of registered ministers and to guard the gospel against error. The council also regulates church premises and places of worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Nigeria
Governance
- 15 July 1975: Standard registration
- 05 April 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 April 2011: Funds transferred to 1140559 INTERNATIONAL MINISTERIAL COUNCIL OF GREAT BRITAIN
- I M C G B (Working name)
- IMCGB (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL MINISTERIAL COUNCIL OF GREAT BRITAIN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.72k | £32.46k | £39.26k | £34.51k | £35.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.91k | £42.01k | £33.79k | £38.79k | £33.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 08 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 08 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 01 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 01 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 16 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 16 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
THE SPREADING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT BRITAIN BY MEANS OF PREACHING, WORSHIP, EVANGELISM, AND SOCIAL AND CHARITABLE WORK INCLUDING EDUCATION IN LANGUAGE AND LITERACY AND THEOLOGICAL COURSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window