RARE BREEDS SURVIVAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RBST works to conserve the UKÔÇÖs rare native breeds of farm animals and acts as a last resort against the extinction of a native breed from disease, inbreeding or changes in fashion. RBSTÔÇÖs mission is to promote pedigree rare breeds; support and encourage responsible breeding programmes; maintain a gene bank of rare bloodlines; and carry out technical breed research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£729,834
Donations and legacies | £472.49k | |
Charitable activities | £120.71k | |
Other trading activities | £22.47k | |
Investments | £114.17k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£699,259
Raising funds | £202.43k | |
Charitable activities | £496.83k | |
Other | £0 |
£33,103 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £202.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £496.83k | |
Retained for future use | £30.58k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £202.43k | |
Charitable expenditure | £496.83k | |
Retained for future use | £63.68k |
People

8 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 June 1982: Standard registration
- R B S T (Working name)
- RARE BREEDS SURVIVAL TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Atkinson | Chair | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Patricia Pope | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Davies | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John William Reed | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Whittle | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Philip Fairfax | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jan Valentine McCourt | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof James Gordon Dalrymple Prendergast | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William McMinn | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Le Grice-Mack | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Dalrymple Fanshawe | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Perry | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £527.48k | £635.69k | £712.55k | £575.65k | £729.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £715.89k | £701.95k | £607.15k | £664.20k | £699.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £344.96k | £510.92k | £552.35k | £389.54k | £472.49k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.70k | £14.80k | £13.49k | £15.69k | £22.47k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £45.60k | £20.19k | £49.46k | £55.66k | £120.71k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £125.23k | £89.78k | £97.26k | £114.76k | £114.17k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £21.59k | £243.44k | £211.14k | £72.07k | £124.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £502.62k | £534.60k | £447.39k | £474.54k | £496.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £213.27k | £167.35k | £159.76k | £189.67k | £202.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.91k | £16.23k | £23.90k | £30.36k | £11.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £17.70k | £15.86k | £18.02k | £18.18k | £17.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £135.73k | £119.94k | £104.73k | £98.74k | £100.15k | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.10m | £3.05m | £3.54m | £3.15m | £3.12m | |
|
Other assets | £143.51k | £89.64k | £96.18k | £125.24k | £214.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £50.90k | £46.38k | £45.63k | £63.48k | £63.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 DEC 1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUN 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUN 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUN 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED AND WHICH SHALL BE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY ARE TO DO ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING THINGS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ATTAINING THE OBJECTS IF AND SO FAR AS ALLOWED BY LAW AND OBSERVING AND PERFORMING WHATEVER MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW IN ORDER LEGALLY TO CARRY OUT THE OBJECTS 2.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF BREEDS AND BREEDING GROUPS OF DOMESTIC LIVESTOCK OF IMPORTANCE IN THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE BEING BREEDS AT RISK, AND HAVING CHARACTERISTICS WORTHY OF PRESERVATION IN THE INTEREST OF ZOOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF GENES OF SPECIAL OR POTENTIAL VALUE IN HYBRIDISATION AND OTHER WORK. 2.2 TO CONDUCT CARRY OUT AND PROMOTE RESEARCH (INCLUDING THE SPONSORING THEREOF) INTO THE FOREGOING MATTERS WHICH CONSTITUTE THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST AND INTO RELATED MATTERS DIRECTED TO INCREASING THE SUM OF COMMUNICABLE KNOWLEDGE THEREOF AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH. 2.3 THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES 'CHARITABLE' MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rare Breeds Survival Trust
National Agricultural Centre
Stoneleigh Park
KENILWORTH
CV8 2LG
- Phone:
- 02476696551
- Email:
- enquiries@rbst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window