Financial history OULTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 269461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.71k £35.27k £41.47k £58.71k £47.68k
Total expenditure £30.47k £28.83k £33.97k £94.48k £48.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £20.14k £20.43k £15.48k £15.05k