THE JANATHA STUBBS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 269508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide funds for charitable purposes with preference being given to:- 1. The raising of artistic taste of the public, whether in relation to music, drama, opera, painting, sculpture or other fine arts; 2. The promotion of education in the fine arts, academic education or Christian religion; 3. The provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £10,039
Total expenditure: £5,840

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Malta

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JOANNA LOUISE LAING Trustee
John Moores Painting Prize Trust
Received: On time
THE SUNFLOWERS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROBERT MICHAEL STUBBS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.02k £3 £1 £10.01k £10.04k
Total expenditure £4.37k £2.27k £2.24k £7.86k £5.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rathbones Trust Company Limited
Port of Liverpool Building
Pier Head
Liverpool
L3 1NW
Phone:
0151236666
Website:

No information available