ANTHONY DU BOULAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is a grant making charity whose objects are the advancement of education,the relief of poverty,the promotion of religion and such other objects being charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 1975: Standard registration
- 08 June 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.32k | £17.09k | £9.54k | £0 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.13k | £51.68k | £370.53k | £48.92k | £40.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 14 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 5TH MAY 1975
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION AND SUCH OTHER PUBLIC OBJECTS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME AND AT ANY TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window