Financial history JULIA MARY PARKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.05k £16.79k £15.23k £29.27k £29.84k
Total expenditure £49.36k £12.06k £6.49k £45.79k £49.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A