THE ORPINGTON AND DISTRICT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Archaeological excavation and presentation to the public in the Orpington area. Dissemination of archaeological and historical information principally via monthly lectures and a quarterly magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £1,200 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 14 March 1985: Standard registration
- 10 November 2022: Funds received from 277315 KINGSTON UPON THAMES ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
- ODAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET CLAYTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Julia Dodds | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Elizabeth Gray | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Besford | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Russell | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Booker | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MEEKUMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN TOY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.27k | £3.07k | £2.76k | £7.74k | £15.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.30k | £3.26k | £3.38k | £4.13k | £4.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8T MARCH 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE STUDY OF ARCHAEOLOGY, HISTROY AND KINDRED SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
ORPINGTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Mount Ash Road
LONDON
SE26 6LY
- Phone:
- 020 7274 5279
- Email:
- orparchsoc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window