Financial history MID-SUSSEX POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 269569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £602 £140 £339 £1.20k £3.33k
Total expenditure £5.05k £1.45k £553 £553 £553
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A