THE ELEPHANT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS AND TO DEVELOP ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ARTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN COOK | Chair | 01 July 2008 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Gronlund | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ghislaine Charlotte Eva Leung | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Larry Achiampong | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Musgrave | Trustee | 24 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janice Kerbel | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Basciano | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CAREY-THOMAS | Trustee | 30 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY WILLIAM ROLAND PENROSE | Trustee | 10 July 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.24k | £86.21k | £179.99k | £69.49k | £78.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.82k | £122.57k | £144.73k | £157.96k | £158.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH AUGUST 1975
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS AND TO DEVELOP ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ARTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
64 Nile Street
London
- Phone:
- 0000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window