Accounts and annual returns BASINGSTOKE'S WOMEN'S REFUGE

Charity Number: 269649
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 10 March 2009 38 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 01 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 08 March 2007 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 10 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 October 2005 On Time