DEPTFORD ACTION GROUP FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of DAGE is to combat social isolation for pensioners of Lewisham and Greenwich by the provision of a pop-in facility for social contact, an advice and information service providing help with forms and referrals to specialist agencies, and the provision of advice from fire safety to crime prevention. The DAGE charity shop will make affordable items available to pensioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 15 December 1975: Standard registration
- DAGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Haward | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Doyle | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HINDMARSH | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.25k | £93.31k | £45.53k | £23.91k | £12.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.65k | £76.99k | £79.60k | £36.06k | £8.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £67.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/02/1975 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1975. AS AMENDED ON 19 AUG 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR IS HEREAFTER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND GREENWICH, BUT PARTICULARLY THOSE PARTS KNOWN AS DEPTFORD.
Area of benefit
BOROUGHS OF LEWISHAM AND GREENWICH ESPECIALLY DEPTFORD AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
D A G E
71 Deptford High Street
Deptford
LONDON
SE8 4AA
- Phone:
- 02086912849
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window