Accounts and annual returns THE LANGLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 269720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window