EVANGELISM EXPLOSION (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangelism Training & Support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 1975: Standard registration
- EE (GB) LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Shaun Graham | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Gisele Molisho | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth John Lewis | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.26k | £16.50k | £11.60k | £16.83k | £9.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.69k | £18.22k | £15.04k | £18.43k | £9.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 5TH JUNE 1975
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN ALL OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Handlow Cottage
Churcham
GLOUCESTER
GL2 8BW
- Phone:
- 07710022443
- Email:
- info@ee-gb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window