Financial history PAIGNTON LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 269745
Charity reporting is overdue by 382 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £14 £26 £20 £2 £8.32k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.00k £1.50k £7.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A