JEWISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) promoting academic, clinical, professional and social links between Jewish doctors, dentists and associated health care professionals in the UK, and between the UK and Israel in the field of medicine and healthcare 2) awarding bursaries for UK medical students to spend an 'elective' period in Israel and providing scholarships to attend conferences of Jewish interest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Birmingham City
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Nottingham City
- Australia
- Israel
Governance
- 30 July 1975: Standard registration
- JEWISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (UK) (Working name)
- ISRAEL MEDICAL ASSOCIATION BRITISH FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof David R Katz | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor MERVYN JASWON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.08k | £21.71k | £16.84k | £26.53k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.72k | £20.78k | £16.23k | £17.62k | £19.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 273 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 393 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2022 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 October 2020 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 October 2020 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND AIMS ADOPTED ON 23 JANUARY 1975 AS AMENDED ON 23 FEBRUARY 1976 AND 5 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION IN ISRAEL BY ARRANGING WITH SUCH PERSONS TO VISIT HOSPITALS, MEDICAL CENTRES, GENERAL PRACTITIONERS AND OTHER MEDICAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
JEWISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
PO BOX 38278
LONDON
NW3 4YG
- Phone:
- 02077943888
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window