CONNOR DOWNS AND GWITHIAN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 269800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a womens institute in a village in Cornwall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,859
Total expenditure: £6,979

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 August 1975: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 18 August 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN DUSTOW Trustee
CONNOR DOWNS RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JANE MILLS Trustee
CAMBORNE REDRUTH HAYLE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MARGARET NORTHEY WATSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.05k £13.71k £2.16k £5.66k £7.86k
Total expenditure £4.48k £4.77k £2.82k £4.64k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 January 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 November 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 TURNPIKE ROAD
CONNOR DOWNS
HAYLE
TR27 5DT
Phone:
01736752266
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available