Financial history TEMPLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 269840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/04/2020 29/04/2021 29/04/2022 29/04/2023 29/04/2024
Total gross income £10.07k £22.63k £15.08k £7.19k £9.09k
Total expenditure £8.88k £4.98k £9.85k £14.15k £10.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.57k £10.67k N/A N/A