QUIET WATERS CHRISTIAN RETREAT HOUSE

Charity number: 269866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A place of Christian Retreat for rest, refreshment, renewal and education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £88,245
Total expenditure: £104,160

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 August 1975: Standard registration
  • 07 July 2022: Funds received from 1149636 THE CREATIVE ARTS RETREAT MOVEMENT
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Nicholas Dunning Chair 17 April 2021
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
BUNGAY COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Peter Alan Walker Trustee 08 December 2024
RISING STARS OF MALAWI
Recently registered
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
James Stuart Gordon Trustee 08 December 2024
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Roger Charles Yaxley Trustee 08 December 2024
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Life Church Beccles
Received: On time
BUNGAY ARTS AND THEATRE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Simon Paul Ward Trustee 19 April 2024
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Kathleen Janet Males Trustee 27 July 2022
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen John Harris Trustee 09 October 2017
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Margaret Harris Trustee 09 October 2017
THE ANAPAUO CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £65.12k £87.17k £69.59k £96.35k £88.25k
Total expenditure £73.15k £61.03k £62.48k £70.50k £104.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.67k £27.80k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 18 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Quiet Waters Christian Retreat House
Flixton Road
Bungay
Suffolk
NR35 1PD
Phone:
01986893201