C AND F TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to assist in the further education of pupils from Haygrove School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 September 1975: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- HAYGROVE SCHOOL C & F FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN CANHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Spencer | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tina Stoel-Walker | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494 | £0 | £0 | £8.46k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.08k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 February 2025 | 742 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH MAY 1975
Charitable objects
FURTHER EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS FROM HAYGROVE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRIDGWATER
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYGROVE SECONDARY SCHOOL
DURLEIGH ROAD
BRIDGWATER
SOMERSET
TA6 7HW
- Phone:
- 01278455531
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window