ESSEX POLICE SUPPORT STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support to members of police staff relating to welfare needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 14 August 1975: Standard registration
- ESSEX POLICE CIVILIAN STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- ESSEX POLICE CIVILIAN STAFF WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY FABER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £5.45k | £5.09k | £4.69k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.84k | £4.73k | £4.88k | £6.12k | £6.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 16 JULY AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 1982 AND 18 FEBRUARY 1985 AND 15 NOVEMBER 1988 AND 8 DECEMBER 1993 AND 24 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO WORK OR HAVE WORKED FULL TIME OR PART TIME FOR THE POLICE AUTHORITY, BY MEANS OF CASH GRANTS OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE. (FOR DETAILS SEE RULE NO.3).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - NORMALLY ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
POLICE HEADQUARTERS
PO BOX 2
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6DA
- Phone:
- 01245452597
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window