GEORGE BUTCHER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 269905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Charity are to assist in the advancement, education and training of students, apprentices, school leavers, univeristy graduates and other persons under the age of 30 years from the Town of Baldock and neighbouring villages. The Grants to be used towards the provisions of text books, fees for tuition and entrolment for educational courses, tools and implements of the trade.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £1,200
Total expenditure: £1,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 September 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
michael Muir Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Rev anthony Ronald ruffell Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
MICHAEL JOSEPH WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
KEVIN SMITH Trustee
None on record
GILLIAN MARGARET HOPKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £624 £627 £623 £680 £1.20k
Total expenditure £600 £350 £675 £550 £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 KYRKEBY
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 2PB
Phone:
0146264650
Website:

No information available