Financial history THE GREAT BRITAIN-CHINA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 269944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.59k £92.67k £66.88k £82.90k £84.48k
Total expenditure £152.84k £75.52k £48.22k £93.93k £88.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A