THE JOHN CURWEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 269953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PROMOTION OF MUSIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE USE OF THE NEW CURWEN METHOD OF AURAL TRAINING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1975: Standard registration
  • 25 June 1997: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 25 June 1997: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE CURWEN INSTITUTE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN DOWDING Chair
None on record
Doris Smith Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record
Hazel Carroll Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
Mary Henry Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
Malcolm Coates Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
MR HAL DIAL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 January 2025 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 January 2025 564 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 January 2025 929 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 July 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 13 AUGUST 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FREE PLACES FOR STUDENTS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AT THE SUMMER SCHOOLS ORGANISED BY THE TONIC SOL-FA ASSOCIATION LTD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR CANDIDATES PRESENTED BY DR. BARNARDO'S AND THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 October 1975 : Standard registration
  • 25 June 1997 : Removed
  • 25 June 1997 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Lane Heads House
Watery Gate Lane
Great Eccleston
PRESTON
PR3 0XH
Phone:
01995670999
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available