THE TALKING NEWSPAPER OF HARROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a weekly recording of news & information, gathered from the local press and disseminated to those whose sight is impaired or who have a temporary or permanent condition that inhibits their ability to read a newspaper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 13 October 1975: Standard registration
- HARROW TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Anne Turner | Chair | 09 April 2007 |
|
|
||||||
Subhash Khagram | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
RASHMIKANT NAVALCHAND MEHTA | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
VALERIE CLARK | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MR T EMERY | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA MAY LYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID VICTOR CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SHEILA ETHEL COLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £22.28k | £980 | £5.61k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £4.96k | £6.31k | £4.69k | £4.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/06/1975 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, WHO ARE LIVING IN, OR HAVE LIVED IN OR IN THE VICINITY OF, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW, BY THE PROVISION OF AUDIO RECORDINGS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 1
CENTRAL DEPOT
FORWARD DRIVE
HARROW
MIDDLESEX
HA3 8NT
- Phone:
- 02089079677
- Email:
- pcandbturner@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
harrowtn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window