ACWW NUTRITION EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and encouragement of education in nutrition among women in areas where malnutrition and its attendant deficiencies put families at risk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 19 September 1975: Standard registration
- 21 November 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1174798 ASSOCIATED COUNTRY WOMEN OF THE WORLD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28 | £851 | £1.47k | £15.59k | £24.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.35k | £9.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 27 November 2017 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 27 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JULY 1975
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENTS OF EDUCATION IN NUTRITION AMONG ALL WOMEN IN AREAS WHERE MALNUTRITION AND ITS ATTENDANT DEFICIENCIES PUT FAMILIES AT RISK. THESE WOULD INCLUDE MEMBERS OF SOCIETIES AFFILIATED TO THE ASSOCIATED COUNTRY WOMEN OF THE WORLD AND ANY OTHER COUNTRY WOMEN IN NEED OF INSTRUCTION. (B) SELECTION OF POTENTIAL TEACHERS/DEMONSTRATORS TO RECEIVE BASIC TRAINING IN ORDER TO ORGANISE AND MAINTAIN INSTRUCTION AT VILLAGE LEVEL INCLUDING THE FORMATION OF WOMENS GROUPS TO THIS END.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window