WORLD COMPASSION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to further education, advance of the Christian faith, encourage missionary activity, relieve the poor and needy and to provide help and comfort for the sick and aged, to raise awareness of the needs of people, and to promote unity among the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Afghanistan
- Burma
- China
- Cuba
- Iran
- Iraq
Governance
- 01 October 1975: Standard registration
- LIVING SOUND INTERNATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- ST CATHERINE'S TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Cleverly | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARRIS | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Jason Law | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.12k | £78.00k | £163.72k | £95.02k | £147.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.85k | £71.42k | £163.16k | £77.56k | £152.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/07/1975 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/1992 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 18/03/2011
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
World Compassion Trust
PO BOX 157
157 Parc Bryn Derwen
PONTYCLUN
CF72 0ER
- Phone:
- 03302233957
- Email:
- info@worldcompassion.tv
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window