BRIGHTWALTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The only community space in Brightwalton. - for hire for regular, public and private hire. Currently home to many community groups and activities including annual fete in May.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 15 October 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evelyn Bracey | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Michael Ananin | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Holly-Jasmine Kilvington | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANNA BRITNOR GUEST | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Delahunty | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wheatley-Hince | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Wapshott | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Aird | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Moore | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wendy Judge | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.89k | £6.36k | £6.78k | £16.61k | £16.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.70k | £6.11k | £6.72k | £19.39k | £9.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH MAY 1975 as amended on 17 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THEPARISH OF BRIGHTWALTON IN THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF BRIGHTWALTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brightwalton Village Hall
Common Lane
BRIGHTWALTON
NEWBURY
BERKSHIRE
RG20 7DH
- Phone:
- 01488 638700
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window