M B GRABOWSKI FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) to advance the study of Polish affairs by British students by the provision of scholarships and exhibitions. 2) to spread knowledge of Poland, polish history and culture 3) promote research and publicise its results 4) promote and finance the mutual exchange of Christian students between Britian and Poland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 1975: Standard registration
- 09 July 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 July 2009: Funds transferred to 1119423 THE POLISH CATHOLIC MISSION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.13k | £105.70k | £70.16k | £73.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.72k | £85.26k | £102.24k | £85.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 28 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 28 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 09 November 2006 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 02 December 2005 | 32 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 5TH AUGUST 1975
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF POLISH STUDIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window