Financial history THE LERRYN AND ST VEEP MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 270132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.16k £12.44k £10.55k £15.31k £15.24k
Total expenditure £13.53k £4.30k £7.45k £15.19k £11.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A