FRENFORD YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 270142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CLUB PROVIDES A RANGE OF SERVICES, WHICH TARGETS THE MOST VULNERABLE, DISADVANTAGED AND DISAFFECTED. WE AIM TO HELP THESE YOUNG PEOPLE TO GROW, DEVELOP AND THRIVE BY OFFERING THEM APPROPRIATE SUPPORT, OPPORTUNITIES AND CHOICES. OUR WORK ALSO ENCOMPASSES CLOSE RELATIONSHIPS WITH LOCAL SHOOLS, FAMILY GROUPS, COMMUNITY GROUPS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 October 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • FRENFORD CLUBS ILFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS CHARLES NOEL HURST Chair
REDBRIDGE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Dr Muhammad Waqqas Naqvi Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
GRAHAM RUSSELL SANDY MBE Trustee
None on record
Martin Denis Solder Trustee
VISION REDBRIDGE CULTURE AND LEISURE
Received: On time
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BOYS' AND GIRLS' CLUBS
Received: On time
NORTH AVENUE YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
EAST OF ENGLAND AND EAST MIDLANDS REGIONAL YOUTH WORK UNIT
Received: On time
RICHARD FRANCIS BROWN Trustee
None on record
ROBERT FITZJOHN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £588.63k £1.56m £1.02m £957.90k £0
Total expenditure £1.08m £541.58k £832.94k £1.04m £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.97k £136.50k £37.06k £87.40k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £226.16k £1.40m £585.43k £351.75k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £356.02k £147.92k £419.25k £584.11k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £386 £59 £16 £1.39k N/A
Income - Other £6.07k £11.39k £12.55k £20.65k N/A
Income - Legacies £226.16k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £547.12k £509.04k £832.94k £994.78k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.39k £32.54k £0 £47.36k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £78.20k £136.12k £128.07k £80.12k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £504.81k £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JACK CARTER CENTRE
THE DRIVE
ILFORD
ESSEX
IG1 3PS
Phone:
020 85180992