MOUNT HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 270147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote and provide for the advancement of education of children of both sexes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MOUNT HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Trahair Trustee 13 August 2020
None on record
Mount Kelly Foundation Governors Trustee 20 June 2014
THE MOUNT KELLY FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mount Kelly
Parkwood Road
TAVISTOCK
PL19 0HZ
Phone:
01822813100