FRIENDS OF CLIFTON HILL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils at the school. To foster more extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school. To publicise the school and make FOCH link with the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 November 1975: Standard registration
- F O C H (Working name)
- CLIFTON HILL SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Wijsveld | Chair | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE ALLEN | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Doble | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.87k | £3.51k | £3.07k | £668 | £4.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £3.43k | £1.33k | £2.54k | £950 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 6 JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY); TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. AND TO PUBLICISE THE SCHOOL TO MAKE FOCH LINK WITH THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLIFTON HILL SCHOOL
CHALDON ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 5PN
- Phone:
- 01883347740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window