GWEEK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playgroups, primary school gym/dance, amateur drama and pantomime (rehearsal and performance), indoor archery, ballroom dancing and tea dancing, luncheon clubs, parish council meetings, antiques club, visually impaired people's club, fundraising , private parties, lectures films and demonstrations, U3A (art, sport)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 May 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN LESLIE TONEY MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Dorothy Palmer | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Vincent Joseph Miller | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALEXANDER TYNDALE-BISCOE | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brown | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aline Yvonne Ghislaine Katerine Denduytes Turner | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs S Piggott | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS M. VANDA TROTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.62k | £16.10k | £21.46k | £9.51k | £10.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £5.61k | £5.31k | £12.60k | £12.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH APRIL 1976 as amended on 16 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF GWEEK AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GWEEK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
MENKEA COTTAGE
ROSKROW
PENRYN
TR10 9AP
- Phone:
- 01326373767
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window