HOSPITAL RADIO NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help relieve the stress and distress of patients in hospital and hospital settings through a personalised befriending service and radio broadcast to bedsides.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 October 1975: Standard registration
- HRN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE SARRE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Baker | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PROUDFOOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS IRENEE BATCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON MARK DRANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.40k | £5.27k | £4.89k | £3.03k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70k | £2.10k | £3.86k | £2.35k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1978, 7TH NOVEMBER 1979, 27TH FEBRUARY 1984, 24TH FEBRUARY 1988, 22ND JANUARY 1989, 27TH FEBRUARY 1991 AND 24 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 12TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND THE STRESS AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO PERSONS THROUGH HOSPITALISATION AS WELL AS HELP TO DISTRACT FROM THE MONOTONY OF HOSPITAL ROUTINE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA SERVED BY NORFOLK AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOSPITAL RADIO NORWICH
WEST ANNEXE 1
NORFOLK & NORWICH UNIVERSITY HOSPIT
COLNEY LANE
NORWICH
NR4 7UY
- Phone:
- 01603454585
- Email:
- studio@hrnorwich.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window