THOMAS HENRY WYATT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides funds towards the maintenance of the fabric of the church of St. Lawrence, Weston Patrick, Hampshire also towards the upkeep and maintenance of the churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 November 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Avril Don | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Alexander Miller Longfield | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Chris Dudgeon | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Richard Butler | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96 | £92 | £89 | £111 | £189 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 November 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN PPR 10/11/1920, AS AMENDED ON 14TH NOVEMBER 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2)(D)(I) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED ON 07 FEBRUARY 2006 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D)(II)
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. LAURENCE WESTON PATRICK OR FOR OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCHYARD THEREOF OR ANY FUTURE EXTENSIONS OF SUCH CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, WESTON PATRICK CUM WESTON CORBETT
Contact information
- Address:
-
WYATT HOUSE
WESTON PATRICK
BASINGSTOKE
RG25 2NX
- Phone:
- 07939 201573
- Email:
- lesleydon6@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window