THE SENIOR LUNCH CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The establishment and maintenance of a meeting place where the elderly, disabled and lonley can interact socially in a safe and relaxed atmosphere. The lunch club provides tea, coffee, and hot meals (Wednesday to Friday), transport is arranged on Thursdays to collect and deliver members to their homes. The centre also provides a chiropody service for our members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 September 1976: Standard registration
- 25 November 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1190451 SHERBORNE COMMUNITY KITCHEN
- AGE CONCERN SHERBORNE (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.20k | £35.32k | £36.65k | £37.00k | £16.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.19k | £34.17k | £35.32k | £36.03k | £14.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.69k | £351 | N/A | £500 | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 9TH AUGUST 2007. AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN SHERBORNE RURAL AND URBAN DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
SHERBORNE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.