SHILOH PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of the Gospel of Jesus Christ and to provide a place of worship and spiritual guidance to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 January 1969: Standard registration
- SHILOH PENTECOSTAL CHURCH DALSTON (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simmone Zachariah | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALVA SEMPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDY GREENAWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUGUSTUS WOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.36k | £99.75k | £99.13k | £93.50k | £101.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.98k | £50.69k | £72.30k | £84.03k | £101.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JULY 1968
Charitable objects
PROPAGATION OF AND INSTRUCTION IN THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN FIRST SCHEDULE TO TRUST DEED 22ND JULY 1968
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shiloh Church
Ashwin Street
London
E8 3DL
- Phone:
- 02072540884
- Email:
- SHILOHDALSTON@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window