THE WALPOLE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouragement of the study of the history of British Art by the publication of an annual volume containing transcriptions of original documents and the results of research into British Art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 January 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Clare Elizabeth Hornsby | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Catherine Daunt | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr William Aslet | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Margaret MacLeod | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christina Juliet Faraday | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alexander John Marr | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Giles Howard Mandelbrote | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Lawrence John Hendra | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RICHARD STEPHENS | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.14k | £50.73k | £41.98k | £46.03k | £95.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.49k | £30.23k | £31.72k | £41.55k | £22.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1959 AS AMENDED 11TH JULY 1968, 25TH JULY 1974 AND 17TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE COLLECTION OF MATERIALS FOR THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF BRITISH ART. (B) TO PUBLISH SO FAR AS IS PRACTICABLE AN ANNUAL VOLUME CONTAINING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND RESULTS OF RESEARCH IN THE HISTORY OF BRITISH ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 Cambridge Street
LONDON
SW1V 4QQ
- Phone:
- 07595661825
- Website:
-
walpolesociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window