Friends of Hatcham College

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for extra facilities for school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Lewisham
Governance
- 22 June 1976: Standard registration
- 11 April 1995: Removed
- THE FRIENDS OF ASKE'S COLLEGE (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ASKE'S COLLEGE (YEARS 7-13) (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ASKE'S SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ingrid Lunden Owen | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thorsten Gailing | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lourdes Walsh | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jos Howard | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Ruth Davis | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marsh Dekker | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | £1.09k | £4.37k | £9.68k | £12.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89k | £2.97k | £4.60k | £7.71k | £8.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1973 AS AMENDED 21 FEBRUARY 1975, 23 FEBRUARY 1976, 31 OCTOBER 1979 AND 18TH OCTOBER 1995. as amended on 16 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE HABERDASHERS' ASKE'S HATCHAM HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILTIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Linked charities
- 22 June 1976 : Standard registration
- 11 April 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haberdashers' Hatcham College
Jerningham Road
LONDON
SE14 5NY
- Phone:
- 02076529510
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window