22ND ODIHAM (FLEET) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 270304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

It provides a wide ranging programme of exciting activities for young people (6-15 years). The aim is to develop their physical, mental and social skills so that they become better future citizens.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,377
Total expenditure: £6,941

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 22ND ODIHAM SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID MANSFIELD BUNCLARK Chair
None on record
Robert Sime Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
RUTH PATRICIA SCOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.19k £1.28k £4.03k £4.60k £5.38k
Total expenditure £5.14k £4.56k £3.84k £6.18k £6.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 September 2024 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MILLDALE
SPRINGFIELD LANE
FLEET
HANTS
GU51 4AH
Phone:
01252621559
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available