ALFRED SUTTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASPTA's aim is to support our school and community of children, parents and carers, staff and others. We organise activities that are both fun and raise funds - our current goal is to refurbish the school playground. Our main events are Christmas and Summer fairs, coffee mornings for new parents, cake sales and discos and magic shows for the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Reading
Governance
- 10 November 1975: Standard registration
- ALFRED SUTTON PTA (Working name)
- ALFRED SUTTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Stuart Kidd | Chair | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Collisson | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Mussett | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jana Oslejova | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMY REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.68k | £786 | £1.61k | £7.63k | £11.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.23k | £4.65k | £1.11k | £3.59k | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 November 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH OCTOBER 1975 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE ALFRED SUTTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY, (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALFRED SUTTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
WOKINGHAM ROAD
READING
RG6 1JR
- Phone:
- 01189015411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window