SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PROTESTANT MINISTERS THEIR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS (ALSO KNOWN AS MINISTERS' RELIEF SOCIETY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides assistance to Protestant Evangelical Christian ministers who find themselves in financial need, especially in cases of old age or disability. Similarly in the case of the widows or orphaned children of such ministers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- Burma
- India
- Malta
- Philippines
- Russia
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 13 October 1975: Standard registration
- SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PROTESTANT MINISTERS THEIR ORPHANS AND WIDOWS (ALSO KNOWN AS MINISTERS' RELIEF SOCIETY) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JIMMY JOSEPH LOUIS | Chair | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Iorwerth JONES | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Victor Firmin | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Storm Rokos | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER OWEN KINLEY | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MARGARET GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.91k | £18.30k | £15.62k | £8.74k | £1.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.13k | £13.05k | £13.03k | £12.89k | £9.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH APRIL 1927 AND SCHEME OF 24TH FEBRUARY 1977 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23RD MAY 1992 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO GIVE RELIEF TO:- (A) NECESSITOUS PROTESTANT MINISTERS OF ANY DENOMINATION WHO ARE OF GOOD REPUTE WHO HOLD AND PROCLAIM THE DOCTRINES OF FREE AND SOVEREIGN GRACE AND WHO THROUGH SICKNESS OR MENTAL OR BODILY INFIRMITY ARE PREVENTED FROM ACTIVELY CONTINUING THEIR MINISTERIAL LABOURS OR WHO FROM ANY OTHER CAUSE FROM WHICH THEY HAVE NO CONTROL SHALL STAND IN NEED OF ITS BENEFITS (B) FOR NECESSITOUS WIDOWS OF SUCH MINISTERS. (C) FOR NECESSITOUS ORPHANS OF SUCH MINISTERS PROVIDED HOWEVER THAT NO ORPHAN OVER THE AGE OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS SHALL RECEIVE ANY BENEFIT UNLESS HE OR SHE FIRMLY HOLDS THE AFORESAID DOCTRINES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 31
8 Church Street
Inverness
Highland
IV1 1EA
- Phone:
- 07952015915
- Email:
- MINRELSOC@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
ministersreliefsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window