HARRODS LIMITED - RICHARD BURBIDGE STAFF BENEFIT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is in the process of being wound up. Following legal advice and consultation with the Charity Commission, the trustees elected to distribute all of the available funds of the charity to four other independent charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 1975: Standard registration
- 26 June 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.14k | £63.92k | £34.44k | £38.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £10.53k | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 23 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 23 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 16 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2006 | 365 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH APRIL 1918, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1975, DEED OF ALTERATION DATED 11TH MAY 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF PENSIONS AND GRANTS TO FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE COMPANY AND THE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND DEPENDENTS OF FORMER EMPLOYEES WHOSE FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES SHALL IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES REQUIRE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window