GREYFRIARS MISSIONARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a church based trust set up to provide funding for members and charitable organisations working overseas with NGOs, universities and mission societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
Governance
- 18 November 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN WILLIAM HALEY | Chair | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Sven Evan Lewis | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Andrew Seals | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Cross | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MICHAEL HAMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.74k | £94.96k | £90.94k | £103.38k | £93.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.25k | £132.22k | £96.89k | £116.32k | £111.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1975 DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 NOV 1996 DEED OF VARIATION DATED 30 DEC 1998 DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11 JAN 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF CHRISTIAN MISSIONARY WORK IN THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN TRADITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREYFRIARS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
64 FRIAR STREET
READING
RG1 1EH
- Phone:
- 01189516700
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window