THE TRUST FOR SING FOR PLEASURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sing for Pleasure encourages the enjoyment of better singing through: * A supportive and structured training programme for conductors, vocal leaders and teachers of class and choir. * A variety of quality singing opportunities for children and adults at all levels of experience and ability. * A well designed range of high quality singing, conducting and teaching resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 December 1975: Standard registration
- SING FOR PLEASURE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miles Wallis-Clarke | Chair | 20 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Jane Hampson | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Catherine Beddison | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Pinfold | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JONES | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA PARKER | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.00k | £70.54k | £132.99k | £226.00k | £186.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.21k | £52.03k | £118.07k | £149.53k | £167.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/10/1974 AS AMENDED ON 17/08/2013 as amended on 15 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MUSIC EDUCATION IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Bolton Music Service
Mere Hall
Merehall Street
Bolton
BL1 2QT
- Phone:
- 08000184164
- Email:
- admin@singforpleasure.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window